Senate | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1958 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1958 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1862 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4135 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1610 | Journal Page: 4135 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4135 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4134 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4010 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1562 | Journal Page: 4009 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 4009 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Amended | 1-M. Gonzlez | Journal Page: 4008 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4008 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1529 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1958 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 305 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |