Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2127 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Analysis April 14, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 5, 2023

Senate Amendments Printing

Bill
Fiscal Note
Analysis

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill May 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2023