Senate | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1497 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2915 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2708 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | RV#870 | Journal Page: 2707 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2707 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2707 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2564 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Amended | 1-Thimesch | Journal Page: 2564 |
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2564 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1448 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 559 | |
House | 02/09/2023 | Filed |