Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2188 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Paul (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 2188
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2023;
 April 18, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualifications of statistical agents for the
 commissioner of insurance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 38.203, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 38.203.  QUALIFICATIONS OF STATISTICAL AGENT. To
 qualify as a statistical agent, an organization must demonstrate at
 least two [five] years of experience in data collection, data
 maintenance, data quality control, accounting, and related areas.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *