Senate | 04/24/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1200 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1748 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | RV#356 | Journal Page: 1747 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1747 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1747 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1695 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Record vote | RV#335 | Journal Page: 1695 |
House | 04/19/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1695 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1695 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1497 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 566 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 566 | |
House | 02/13/2023 | Filed |