House
|
04/28/2023
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 1325
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1009
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 566
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 566
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|