House | 05/10/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3768 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 876 | Journal Page: 3768 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Postponed | 5/10/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3433 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3433 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2049 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 567 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 567 | |
House | 02/13/2023 | Filed |