Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1548
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2848
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#959
|
Journal Page: 2847
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2847
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2847
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2780
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#905
|
Journal Page: 2779
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2779
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Troxclair
|
Journal Page: 2779
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2779
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1048
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 567
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|