Senate | 05/12/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1855 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1855 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1821 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3922 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1533 | Journal Page: 3921 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3921 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3921 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3847 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1482 | Journal Page: 3846 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3846 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3846 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1009 | |
House | 03/23/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1855 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Community Safety, Select | Journal Page: 567 | |
House | 02/13/2023 | Filed |