Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2244 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/13/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            88R7617 JG-F
 By: Campos H.B. No. 2244


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a pilot project to provide
 supportive housing services through Medicaid to persons
 experiencing chronic homelessness.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle I, Title 4, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 542 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 542. TEXAS PATHWAYS PILOT PROJECT
 Sec. 542.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "pilot project"
 means the Texas pathways pilot project established by the
 commission under this chapter.
 Sec. 542.002.  CHRONIC HOMELESSNESS. (a) For purposes of
 this chapter, an individual or family is considered to be
 experiencing chronic homelessness if the individual or family:
 (1)  is homeless and living or residing in a safe haven,
 emergency shelter, or place not meant for human habitation;
 (2)  for a continuous year during the preceding year or
 on at least four separate occasions during the preceding three
 years, was homeless and lived or resided in a safe haven, emergency
 shelter, or place not meant for human habitation; and
 (3)  is the head of household who has, or is a member of
 a household whose head of household has:
 (A)  a diagnosed substance use disorder, serious
 mental illness, developmental disability, post-traumatic stress
 disorder, cognitive impairment resulting from a brain injury, or
 chronic illness or disability; or
 (B)  the simultaneous occurrence of any two or
 more of the diagnosed conditions listed in Paragraph (A).
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a)(1), an individual who
 lives or resides in an institutional care facility, including a
 jail, substance use or mental health treatment facility, hospital,
 or other similar facility, for a period of not more than 90 days is
 considered to be experiencing chronic homelessness if, before
 living or residing in the institutional care facility, the
 individual met the requirements of Subsection (a).
 Sec. 542.003.  ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF PILOT PROJECT.
 (a) The commission shall establish and operate a statewide Texas
 pathways pilot project to provide to individuals experiencing
 chronic homelessness supportive housing services through Medicaid,
 including the following services:
 (1)  behavioral health services, including mental
 health and substance use services;
 (2)  case management services;
 (3)  personal care and personal assistance services;
 (4)  home and community-based services; and
 (5)  other housing support services.
 (b)  In establishing the pilot project, the commission shall
 consider and determine:
 (1)  eligibility criteria for participation in the
 pilot project, including criteria on:
 (A)  an individual's health conditions;
 (B)  an individual's housing status; and
 (C)  current or potential costs of providing
 supportive housing services to pilot project participants through
 Medicaid;
 (2)  supportive housing services to be provided to
 pilot project participants, including:
 (A)  outreach and engagement services;
 (B)  housing search assistance;
 (C)  education on tenants' rights and
 responsibilities;
 (D)  eviction prevention services;
 (E)  supportive housing service plans;
 (F)  the coordination of supportive housing
 services with:
 (i)  primary and health home care;
 (ii)  substance use treatment;
 (iii)  mental health treatment;
 (iv)  vision and dental services; and
 (v)  hospital and emergency room services;
 (G)  crisis intervention and critical time
 intervention services;
 (H)  education on independent living skills; and
 (I)  services to link pilot project participants
 to education, job skills training, and employment opportunities;
 (3)  financing and reinvestment strategies that
 account for:
 (A)  the health care costs and housing status of
 Medicaid recipients;
 (B)  the degree to which accurate and current
 information on the housing status of Medicaid recipients is
 available;
 (C)  the health care costs of individuals
 receiving supportive housing services;
 (D)  the health care costs of Medicaid recipients
 who receive Medicaid benefits from federal matching funds available
 under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (Pub. L.
 No. 111-148), as amended by the Health Care and Education
 Reconciliation Act of 2010 (Pub. L. No. 111-152), if applicable;
 (E)  the pilot project's potential impact on costs
 to other entities, such as jails, long-term care facilities, and
 treatment facilities;
 (F)  affordable housing investments that can be
 leveraged to create new housing opportunities for pilot project
 participants; and
 (G)  the amount of flexible service dollars
 available to cover pilot project costs not covered under Medicaid;
 and
 (4)  the administration of benefits under the pilot
 project, including;
 (A)  the role of managed care;
 (B)  the role of supportive housing service
 providers; and
 (C)  the coordination of the pilot project with
 existing and emerging health care systems.
 Sec. 542.004.  REPORTS. (a) Not later than June 1, 2024,
 the commission shall prepare and submit to the governor, lieutenant
 governor, and speaker of the house of representatives a written
 report that includes:
 (1)  a summary of the pilot project's progress;
 (2)  an assessment of the impact of providing
 supportive housing services through Medicaid, including the costs
 to provide the services, to individuals experiencing chronic
 homelessness;
 (3)  an update on any waiver or amendment request
 necessary to modify the state Medicaid plan to provide supportive
 housing services under the pilot project;
 (4)  a description of the supportive housing services
 being provided to individuals experiencing chronic homelessness at
 the time the report is prepared;
 (5)  an analysis of the effectiveness of providing
 supportive housing services at the level at which those services
 are provided at the time the report is prepared;
 (6)  estimates of the costs and potential savings of
 expanding health programs administered by the commission to meet
 the needs of individuals experiencing chronic homelessness;
 (7)  proposed modification to eligibility criteria for
 supportive housing services; and
 (8)  any legislative recommendations.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2026, the commission shall
 prepare and submit to the governor, lieutenant governor, and
 speaker of the house of representatives a final written report on
 the pilot project that includes:
 (1)  a summary of the results of the pilot project;
 (2)  a statement on the pilot project's success in
 providing supportive housing services to individuals experiencing
 chronic homelessness;
 (3)  a recommendation as to whether the pilot project
 should be continued as a pilot project or permanent program; and
 (4)  any legislative recommendations.
 Sec. 542.005.  CONCLUSION; EXPIRATION. (a) The pilot
 project established under this chapter concludes September 1, 2025.
 (b)  This chapter expires September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.