Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2271 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 23, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 11, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 12, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note March 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 14, 2023