E | 06/10/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 06/10/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6490 | |
E | 05/24/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5620 | |
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2480 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4980 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4998 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4635 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2105 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2105 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2105 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2105 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2104 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2104 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2104 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1988 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1690 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1690 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1619 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3346 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Record vote | RV#1116 | Journal Page: 3115 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3115 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3115 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3048 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3048 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2577 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1690 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Community Safety, Select | Journal Page: 571 | |
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed |