Senate | 05/12/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1821 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1526 | Journal Page: 3913 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3913 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Amended | 1-Goldman | Journal Page: 3913 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3913 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3836 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3836 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1856 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 574 | |
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed |