House | 05/06/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3226 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 569 | Journal Page: 3226 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 575 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 575 | |
House | 02/14/2023 | Filed |