Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2333 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 1, 2023
Analysis April 28, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 16, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 28, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023