Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2350 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 14, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2023
Bill May 5, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2023