Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1702 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3859 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3547 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1324 | Journal Page: 3547 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3547 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3547 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3404 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Amended | 1-Shine | Journal Page: 3404 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3403 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1396 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1782 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development | Journal Page: 579 | |
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed |