Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1757
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3839
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1475
|
Journal Page: 3838
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3838
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amended
|
2-M. Gonzlez, J.E. Johnson, and Talarico
|
Journal Page: 3838
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3837
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
Journal Page: 3768
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Failed to pass
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-M. Gonzlez, J.E. Johnson, Bryant, Ramos, and Bernal
|
Journal Page: 3755
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-M. González, J.E. Johnson, Bryant, Ramos, and Bernal
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1)
|
Journal Page: 3755
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3754
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 591
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|