House | 05/06/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3227 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1639 | Journal Page: 3227 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2468 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 594 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 594 | |
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed |