E | 06/18/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 06/18/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6492 | |
E | 05/24/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5620 | |
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2480 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4980 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4998 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4633 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2095 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2095 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2095 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2094 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2094 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2033 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2032 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2060 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1988 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1599 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1599 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1546 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2833 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Record vote | RV#945 | Journal Page: 2833 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2833 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2833 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2765 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2765 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2195 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 308 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |