Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2540
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2426
|
Senate
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2062
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1397
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1397
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1355
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#516
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1987
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#487
|
Journal Page: 1987
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1987
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1986
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1397
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|