Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2915 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2676 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | RV#836 | Journal Page: 2675 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2675 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2675 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2538 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2538 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 628 | |
House | 02/28/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 308 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |