Senate | 05/01/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1442 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1442 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1248 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2049 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1846 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Record vote | RV#421 | Journal Page: 1846 |
House | 04/24/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1846 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1846 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1828 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Record vote | RV#419 | Journal Page: 1828 |
House | 04/21/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1828 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Amended | 1-Hull, Rose, Capriglione, Patterson, Klick, Jetton, Lujan, and Bucy | Journal Page: 1827 |
House | 04/21/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1827 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Postponed | 4/21/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1785 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Postponed 4/21/23 9:00 AM | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1785 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1781 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1442 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 597 | |
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed |