Senate | 05/12/2023 | Referred to Vet Affairs | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1822 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3923 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1534 | Journal Page: 3923 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3923 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3923 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3847 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Amended | 1-Garcia | Journal Page: 3847 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3847 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2914 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1856 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 597 | |
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed |