Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2484 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 4, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 3, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Bill
Fiscal Note
Analysis

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2023
Bill May 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2023
Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note March 30, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023

Conference Committee Report*

Fiscal Note
Bill