Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 932
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#164
|
Journal Page: 1361
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1361
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amended
|
2-Moody
|
Journal Page: 1361
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1361
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#147
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1337
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Patterson, Toth, C.E. Harris, Troxclair, Vasut, Cain, Isaac, Dorazio, Harrison, and Schatzline
|
Journal Page: 1337
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1337
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1048
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 308
|
House
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|