Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB25 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2022
Bill November 15, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 4, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 8, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 8, 2023
Fiscal Note April 2, 2023
Fiscal Note March 22, 2023