House | 05/03/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2852 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 49 | Journal Page: 2852 |
House | 05/01/2023 | Postponed | 5/3/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2492 |
House | 05/01/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2492 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Postponed | 5/1/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2154 |
House | 04/26/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2153 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1529 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 308 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 308 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |