Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2502 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/13/2023 10:30 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately