Senate | 04/20/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1192 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1192 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1071 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1660 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Record vote | RV#320 | Journal Page: 1659 |
House | 04/19/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1659 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1659 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1622 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1622 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1448 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1192 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 308 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |