Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2551 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/13/2023 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H No action taken in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services