House | 05/08/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3374 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Record vote | RV#1258 | Journal Page: 3373 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 3373 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3373 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3340 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3340 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) | Journal Page: 3340 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3340 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 603 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 603 | |
House | 02/21/2023 | Filed |