Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2596 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 88R9664 JRJ-D
22 By: Frazier H.B. No. 2596
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to eligibility of certain current or former members of the
88 Texas National Guard or the Texas Air National Guard for tuition and
99 fee exemptions at public institutions of higher education.
1010 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1111 SECTION 1. Section 54.341(a), Education Code, is amended to
1212 read as follows:
1313 (a) The governing board of each institution of higher
1414 education shall exempt the following persons from the payment of
1515 tuition, dues, fees, and other required charges, including fees for
1616 correspondence courses but excluding general deposit fees, student
1717 services fees, and any fees or charges for lodging, board, or
1818 clothing, provided the person seeking the exemption currently
1919 resides in this state and entered the service at a location in this
2020 state, declared this state as the person's home of record in the
2121 manner provided by the applicable military or other service, or
2222 would have been determined to be a resident of this state for
2323 purposes of Subchapter B at the time the person entered the service:
2424 (1) all nurses and honorably discharged members of the
2525 armed forces of the United States who served during the
2626 Spanish-American War or during World War I;
2727 (2) all nurses, members of the Women's Army Auxiliary
2828 Corps, members of the Women's Auxiliary Volunteer Emergency
2929 Service, and all honorably discharged members of the armed forces
3030 of the United States who served during World War II except those who
3131 were discharged from service because they were over the age of 38 or
3232 because of a personal request on the part of the person that the
3333 person be discharged from service;
3434 (3) all honorably discharged men and women of the
3535 armed forces of the United States who served during the national
3636 emergency which began on June 27, 1950, and which is referred to as
3737 the Korean War; [and]
3838 (4) all persons who were honorably discharged from the
3939 armed forces of the United States after serving on active military
4040 duty, excluding training, for more than 180 days and who served a
4141 portion of their active duty during:
4242 (A) the Cold War which began on the date of the
4343 termination of the national emergency cited in Subdivision (3);
4444 (B) the Vietnam era which began on December 21,
4545 1961, and ended on May 7, 1975;
4646 (C) the Grenada and Lebanon era which began on
4747 August 24, 1982, and ended on July 31, 1984;
4848 (D) the Panama era which began on December 20,
4949 1989, and ended on January 21, 1990;
5050 (E) the Persian Gulf War which began on August 2,
5151 1990, and ends on the date thereafter prescribed by Presidential
5252 proclamation or September 1, 1997, whichever occurs first;
5353 (F) the national emergency by reason of certain
5454 terrorist attacks that began on September 11, 2001; or
5555 (G) any future national emergency declared in
5656 accordance with federal law; and
5757 (5) all current members of the Texas National Guard or
5858 the Texas Air National Guard who have served on active state
5959 military duty, excluding training, for more than 180 days, and all
6060 members of the Texas National Guard or the Texas Air National Guard
6161 who were honorably discharged after serving on active state
6262 military duty, excluding training, for more than 180 days.
6363 SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act to Section
6464 54.341, Education Code, apply beginning with tuition and fees
6565 charged for the 2023 fall semester. Tuition and fees charged for a
6666 term or semester before the 2023 fall semester are covered by the
6767 law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
6868 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
6969 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7070 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
7171 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
7272 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
7373 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.