House | 05/10/2023 | Postponed | 1/9/24 10:00AM | Journal Page: 3823 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 8, Section 10(b) | Journal Page: 3823 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Postponed 1/9/24 10:00AM | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3822 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1048 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 609 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 609 | |
House | 02/22/2023 | Filed |