House | 04/25/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1975 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1055 | Journal Page: 1975 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Postponed | 4/25/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1777 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1777 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1395 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 610 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 610 | |
House | 02/22/2023 | Filed |