Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1703 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3859 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3574 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1344 | Journal Page: 3574 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3574 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Amended | 2-Leo-Wilson | Journal Page: 3573 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3569 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3438 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Record vote | RV#1287 | Journal Page: 3438 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3438 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3436 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2791 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 729 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 729 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 612 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 612 | |
House | 02/22/2023 | Filed |