Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1660 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3714 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3358 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Record vote | RV#1242 | Journal Page: 3358 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3358 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3357 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1226 | Journal Page: 3318 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3318 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3318 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Postponed | 5/6/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3204 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3204 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2048 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1782 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 613 | |
House | 02/22/2023 | Filed |