Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2689 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/22/2023 8:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/25/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 03/22/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 03/22/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule