Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2701 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 5, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2023
Fiscal Note April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2023