House | 04/19/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1667 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1016 | Journal Page: 1667 |
House | 04/17/2023 | Postponed | 4/19/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1516 |
House | 04/17/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1516 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 987 | |
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 616 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 616 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Filed |