Senate | 05/12/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1856 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1822 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1503 | Journal Page: 3886 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3886 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3886 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3809 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3809 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1856 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 617 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Filed |