1 | 1 | | 88R10726 SRA-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Ashby H.B. No. 2737 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to a credit or refund for diesel fuel taxes paid on diesel |
---|
8 | 8 | | fuel used in this state by auxiliary power units or power take-off |
---|
9 | 9 | | equipment. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Section 162.227, Tax Code, is amended by adding |
---|
12 | 12 | | Subsections (d-1), (d-2), and (d-3) to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (d-1) A license holder may take a credit on a return for the |
---|
14 | 14 | | period in which the purchase occurred, and a person who does not |
---|
15 | 15 | | hold a license may file a refund claim with the comptroller, if the |
---|
16 | 16 | | license holder or person paid tax on diesel fuel and the diesel fuel |
---|
17 | 17 | | is used in this state by auxiliary power units or power take-off |
---|
18 | 18 | | equipment on any motor vehicle. If the quantity of that diesel fuel |
---|
19 | 19 | | can be accurately measured while the motor vehicle is stationary by |
---|
20 | 20 | | any metering or other measuring device or method designed to |
---|
21 | 21 | | measure the fuel separately from fuel used to propel the motor |
---|
22 | 22 | | vehicle, the comptroller may approve and adopt the use of the device |
---|
23 | 23 | | as a basis for determining the quantity of diesel fuel consumed in |
---|
24 | 24 | | those operations for a tax credit or tax refund. If there is no |
---|
25 | 25 | | separate metering device or other approved measuring method, the |
---|
26 | 26 | | license holder may take the credit and the person who does not hold |
---|
27 | 27 | | a license may claim the refund on a percentage of the diesel fuel |
---|
28 | 28 | | consumed by each motor vehicle equipped with an auxiliary power |
---|
29 | 29 | | unit or power take-off equipment. The comptroller shall determine |
---|
30 | 30 | | the percentage of diesel fuel for which the credit or refund may be |
---|
31 | 31 | | claimed. The climate-control air conditioning or heating system of |
---|
32 | 32 | | a motor vehicle that has a primary purpose of providing for the |
---|
33 | 33 | | convenience or comfort of the operator or passengers is not a power |
---|
34 | 34 | | take-off system, and a credit or refund may not be allowed for the |
---|
35 | 35 | | tax paid on any portion of the diesel fuel that is used for that |
---|
36 | 36 | | purpose. A credit or refund may not be allowed for the diesel fuel |
---|
37 | 37 | | tax paid on that portion of the diesel fuel that is used for idling. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (d-2) The comptroller shall reduce the amount of the credit |
---|
39 | 39 | | or refund to which a person is otherwise entitled under Subsection |
---|
40 | 40 | | (d-1) according to the following schedule: |
---|
41 | 41 | | (1) for fuel purchased on or after September 1, 2023, |
---|
42 | 42 | | but before January 1, 2024, the comptroller shall reduce the credit |
---|
43 | 43 | | or refund amount by 80 percent; |
---|
44 | 44 | | (2) for fuel purchased on or after January 1, 2024, but |
---|
45 | 45 | | before January 1, 2025, the comptroller shall reduce the credit or |
---|
46 | 46 | | refund amount by 60 percent; |
---|
47 | 47 | | (3) for fuel purchased on or after January 1, 2025, but |
---|
48 | 48 | | before January 1, 2026, the comptroller shall reduce the credit or |
---|
49 | 49 | | refund amount by 40 percent; and |
---|
50 | 50 | | (4) for fuel purchased on or after January 1, 2026, but |
---|
51 | 51 | | before January 1, 2027, the comptroller shall reduce the credit or |
---|
52 | 52 | | refund amount by 20 percent. |
---|
53 | 53 | | (d-3) Subsection (d-2) and this subsection expire January |
---|
54 | 54 | | 1, 2027. |
---|
55 | 55 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|