Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2741 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 10, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 18, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill April 10, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023