Senate | 05/09/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1691 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1691 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1620 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3469 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3278 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1187 | Journal Page: 3278 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3278 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3278 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3168 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3168 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 987 | |
House | 03/27/2023 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1691 | |
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 621 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Filed |