E | 05/24/2023 | Vetoed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5620 | |
E | 05/12/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4318 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1833 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4045 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3857 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1731 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1731 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1731 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1731 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1731 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1731 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1731 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 1746 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 1654 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1543 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1033 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1033 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 970 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Record vote | RV#209 | Journal Page: 1491 |
House | 04/14/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1491 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1491 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1441 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1441 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 906 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1033 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 310 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |