House | 05/12/2023 | Postponed | 11/29/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 4102 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4102 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3961 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1541 | Journal Page: 3960 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3960 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote RV#1540 | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Amended | 2-Kuempel | Journal Page: 3940 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3938 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Amended 1-Kuempel | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Postponed | 5/11/23 3:00 PM | Journal Page: 3876 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Postponed | 5/11/23 7:00 AM | Journal Page: 3793 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3792 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Postponed 5/11/23 7:00 AM | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3771 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3346 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 636 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 636 | |
House | 02/24/2023 | Filed |