Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/17/2023 S Co-sponsor authorized
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately