Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2327
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1505
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2915
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#791
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2622
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2593
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2593
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 638
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|