Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2867 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 2, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill May 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note April 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 1, 2023