Senate | 05/15/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1862 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4088 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1580 | Journal Page: 4088 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4088 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4088 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 4058 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4058 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2791 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 311 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 311 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |